Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 104.20.60.192

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 104.12.60.192
Case Number: 1:2019cv04232
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Copyright report with certified copy of minute order dated 7/19/19 to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: #1 Certified Minute Order)(aee, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: On Plaintiff's notice #5 and pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cn).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC without prejudice (Herman, Timothy)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (gcy, )
June 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC OF FILING FRCP 7.1 AND LR 3.2 DISCLOSURE (Herman, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15964906. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 104.20.60.192
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 104.12.60.192
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?