Krafcky v. Freud America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Theodore Krafky and Theodore Krafcky
Defendant: Freud America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04234
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED complaint by Theodore Krafcky against Freud America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Adeszko, Alexander)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Motion hearing held. Motion by Plaintiff Theodore Krafcky to amend/correct Complaint #16 is granted. Defendant is given 14 days to answer or otherwise plead. Mandatory initial disclosure by no later than 9/28/2019. Status hearing is set for 12/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/14/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS Report Joint Initial by Theodore Krafcky (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Blumenshine, Scott)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Freud America, Inc.'s unopposed motion for an extension of time to and including 7/30/2019 to file its answer #13 is granted. Status hearing set for 8/14/2019 shall stand. Notice of motion date of 8/13/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Theodore Krafcky to amend/correct Complaint at Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Blumenshine, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Freud America, Inc.(Clyder, Patrick)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Paul Clyder for presentment of extension of time #13 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 8/13/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Clyder, Patrick)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Freud America, Inc. for extension of time UNOPPOSED (Clyder, Patrick)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theodore Krafcky by Scott A. Blumenshine (Blumenshine, Scott)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Theodore Krafcky by Alexander Philip Adeszko (Adeszko, Alexander)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for extension of time to answer #7 is granted. Please note, all future motions must be noticed up for a Tuesday, Wednesday, or Thursday. For further details see Judge Dow's webpage. Notice of motion date of July 8, 2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice . (cdh, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Freud America, Inc. (Clyder, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick Paul Clyder for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/8/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Clyder, Patrick)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Freud America, Inc. for extension of time to file answer UNOPPOSED (Clyder, Patrick)
June 29, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 8/14/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
June 25, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Freud America, Inc. by Patrick Paul Clyder (Clyder, Patrick)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clyder, Patrick)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 L 4710) filed by Freud America, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15962367. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint)(Clyder, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krafcky v. Freud America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freud America, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Paul Clyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Krafky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Krafcky
Represented By: Scott A. Blumenshine
Represented By: Alexander Philip Adeszko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?