Dinerstein v. Google, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matt Dinerstein
Defendant: The University of Chicago, Google, LLC and The University of Chicago Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv04311
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, LLC by Kristine A Forderer (Forderer, Kristine)
August 13, 2019 Filing 22 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, LLC by Whitty Somvichian (Somvichian, Whitty)
August 13, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, LLC by Audrey J. Mott-Smith Attorney Appearance Form - Audrey Mott-Smith (Mott-Smith, Audrey)
August 13, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, LLC by Michael G Rhodes Attorney Appearance Form - Michael G. Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The University of Chicago, The University of Chicago Medical Center by Sydney Leaf Schneider (Schneider, Sydney)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The University of Chicago, The University of Chicago Medical Center by Joseph Benjamin Tyson, III (Tyson, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The University of Chicago, The University of Chicago Medical Center by Michael B Slade (Slade, Michael)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants The University of Chicago, The University of Chicago Medical Center by Brian Douglas Sieve (Sieve, Brian)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant Google, LLC.'s motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #14 is granted. Attorney Kristine A Forderer is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Defendant. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16100382. for Defendant GOOGLE LLC (Forderer, Kristine)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendant Google, LLC.'s motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #10 , #11 , and #12 are granted. Attorneys Michael G. Rhodes, Audrey J. Mott-Smith and Whitty Somvichian are given leave to file appearance forms on behalf of Defendant. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16095026. for Defendant Google LLC (Somvichian, Whitty)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16092071. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Audrey Mott-Smith (Mott-Smith, Audrey)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16092004. Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael G. Rhodes (Rhodes, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Google, LLC by Jeffrey Thomas Norberg (Norberg, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matt Dinerstein by J. Eli Wade Scott (Wade Scott, J.)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matt Dinerstein by Michael W Ovca (Ovca, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 9/6/19 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
June 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants The University of Chicago, The University of Chicago Medical Center (lma, )
June 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matt Dinerstein by Benjamin Harris Richman (Richman, Benjamin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matt Dinerstein by Christopher Lillard Dore (Dore, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Matt Dinerstein by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelson, Jay)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Matt Dinerstein; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15972322.(Edelson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinerstein v. Google, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Dinerstein
Represented By: Benjamin Harris Richman
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Christopher Lillard Dore
Represented By: Michael W Ovca
Represented By: J. Eli Wade Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Chicago
Represented By: Brian Douglas Sieve
Represented By: Michael B Slade
Represented By: Joseph Benjamin Tyson, III
Represented By: Sydney Leaf Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Audrey J. Mott-Smith
Represented By: Whitty Somvichian
Represented By: Kristine A Forderer
Represented By: Michael G Rhodes
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Norberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Chicago Medical Center
Represented By: Brian Douglas Sieve
Represented By: Michael B Slade
Represented By: Joseph Benjamin Tyson, III
Represented By: Sydney Leaf Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?