International License Exchange of America, LLC v. AT&T Inc
Plaintiff: International License Exchange of America, LLC
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv04381
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 MAILED Patent Infringement report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Closing Minute Entry dated 7/31/2019)(jh, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Case is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses, and attorney fees 127 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by International License Exchange of America, LLC (Benchell, Neil)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion for extension of time to answer #6 is granted. Motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted.Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff International License Exchange of America, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Benchell, Neil)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: In light of the reassignment, the motion hearing noticed before Judge Bucklo is stricken. The motion is to be re-noticed before Judge Norgle consistent with his Standing Order. No appearance is required on 7/25/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr for all further proceedings pursuant to 28:294(b). Signed by Executive Committee on 7/23/19. (aee, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Neil A Benchell for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #6 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 7/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Benchell, Neil)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff International License Exchange of America, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Benchell, Neil)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International License Exchange of America, LLC as to AT&T Inc on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (Benchell, Neil)
July 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AT&T Inc (jn, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA. (bg, )
June 28, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff International License Exchange of America, LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Benchell, Neil)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by International License Exchange of America, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15980834. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Benchell, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International License Exchange of America, LLC v. AT&T Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International License Exchange of America, LLC
Represented By: Neil A Benchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?