LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" , The
Plaintiff: LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", zhangpingtl, mixi, Guangzhou Xiou watch, kayseamilkshop, hefangfang, aruoquan, Timing Store, watchesbag88, llenli's Watches Store, HAVE A WATCH Store, sandyho_20174, abestchoice, loving girl, minicatstore, TICKTOCK store, chixinjiudui, joystone4u, Chinese Watch factory, powerpartus, HugoLam Store, yiqi_us05, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", The, tech_online, tlzhangping, superparts3, Guangzhou Shenxuan Trade Co.,Ltd., Nice Goods Shop, Memories Watch Store, hanqiuping, GMT, qualitywatchesestore, ServingUpDeals, Sonorous Watch Store, Chinese Watch Factory Store, joypockets, Summer Timepiece, K WATCH Co. Ltd Store and wangli1
Case Number: 1:2019cv04383
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 34 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/6/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 8/6/2019. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #27 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
August 1, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA as to Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", The on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby)
August 1, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby)
August 1, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #27 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/6/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA in support of motion for preliminary injunction #27 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
August 1, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 7/23/2019. Plaintiffs' motion to extend the temporary restraining order #23 is granted. The temporary restraining order is extended to 8/6/2019. Status hearing is set for 8/6/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #23 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/23/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA in support of extension of time #23 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
July 15, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00, Receipt no. 4624226932 posted by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA (jn, )
July 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant AK Watch Co. Ltd Store and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (acm, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/9/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, ) Modified on 8/8/2019 (pk, ).
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 7/9/2019. Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for entry of a temporary restraining order #10 and motion for electronic service of process #15 are all granted. Enter Order. Status hearing is set for 7/23/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA (Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA (Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 , motion for miscellaneous relief #15 , motion for temporary restraining order #10 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/9/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SAfor Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-3 regarding declaration #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2, #3 Exhibit 3-3)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 8/8/2019 (pk, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Nicolas Lambert regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA in support of motion for temporary restraining order #10 (Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-1, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 1-3, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 8/8/2019 (pk, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 8/8/2019 (pk, ).
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pk, )
June 28, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15980869. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA v. Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" , The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: zhangpingtl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mixi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Xiou watch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kayseamilkshop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hefangfang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aruoquan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timing Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: watchesbag88
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: llenli's Watches Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAVE A WATCH Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: sandyho_20174
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: abestchoice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: loving girl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: minicatstore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TICKTOCK store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: chixinjiudui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: joystone4u
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinese Watch factory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: powerpartus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HugoLam Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yiqi_us05
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tech_online
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: tlzhangping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: superparts3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangzhou Shenxuan Trade Co.,Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nice Goods Shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Memories Watch Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hanqiuping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: qualitywatchesestore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServingUpDeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonorous Watch Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinese Watch Factory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: joypockets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Timepiece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K WATCH Co. Ltd Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wangli1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LVMH Swiss Manufactures SA
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?