United States of America v. Amenta et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Electronic Tax Service, Inc., Mark L. Amenta, Barrister Income Tax Service, Inc. and Mark Leonard Amenta
Case Number: 1:2019cv04578
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the government's request, the 9/9/2019 initial status hearing is converted to a telephone status hearing. The government is to provide a conference call number to the Court and all parties prior to the status hearing. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Appearance Form by Mark Leonard Amenta (Mankus, Tony)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Mark Leonard Amenta on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Zhang, Pingping)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Electronic Tax Service, Inc. on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Zhang, Pingping)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America as to Barrister Income Tax Service, Inc. on 8/21/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Zhang, Pingping)
August 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 9/9/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
August 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Mark L. Amenta, Barrister Income Tax Service, Inc., Electronic Tax Service, Inc. (mc, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Pingping Zhang (Zhang, Pingping)
July 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Zhang, Pingping)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Zhang, Pingping)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Amenta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Tax Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Amenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrister Income Tax Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Leonard Amenta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Pingping Zhang
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?