Faxel et al v. Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mrs. Meghan Faxel, Mike Faxel and Meghan Faxel
Defendant: Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04649
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: At the parties request, status hearing previously set for 9/5/19 is stricken and reset to 9/24/19 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiff is given leave to conduct written jurisdictional discovery to be served by 8/29/19 and responses due by 10/1/19. The previously set briefing schedule #13 on Defendant's Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss and/or motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 #8 is vacated. Plaintiffs' response shall be filed by 10/29/19. Defendant's reply shall be filed by 11/12/19. The Court will rule electronically on the motion. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Defendant's Rule 12(b)(2) motion to dismiss and/or motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 #8 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's response shall be filed by 9/19/19. Defendant's reply shall be filed by 10/3/19. The Court will rule electronically. Motion hearing date of 8/22/19 is stricken. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc. (Lessner, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Joseph Eck regarding motion to dismiss, motion to change venue #8 (Lessner, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Justin H. Lessner regarding motion to dismiss, motion to change venue #8 (Lessner, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss, motion to change venue #8 (Lessner, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc. to dismiss and/or, MOTION by Defendant Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc. to change venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 (Lessner, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Justin Harold Lessner for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Lessner, Justin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc. by Justin Harold Lessner (Lessner, Justin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Meghan Faxel, Mike Faxel as to Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc. on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Martin, Amanda)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 9/5/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc. (acm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
July 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Martin, Amanda)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Meghan Faxel; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16016310.(Martin, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faxel et al v. Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Meghan Faxel
Represented By: Amanda Mae Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Faxel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghan Faxel
Represented By: Amanda Mae Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilderness Hotel & Resort, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Harold Lessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?