Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.221.160.118
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.221.160.118
Case Number: 1:2019cv04678
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for early discovery #5 is granted. Status hearing set for 9/26/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Mary K. Schulz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Schulz, Mary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Malibu Media, LLC in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schulz, Mary)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLCfor early discovery (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schulz, Mary)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 exhibit)(cc, )
July 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Case assignment: Random assignment. (pj, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC by Mary K. Schulz (Schulz, Mary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Malibu Media, LLC (Schulz, Mary)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Malibu Media, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16019563. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schulz, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.221.160.118
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Mary K. Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 76.221.160.118
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?