Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.250.180.151
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.250.180.151
Case Number: 1:2019cv04704
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The status hearing set for 9/5/2019 is reset to 10/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS Report by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Herman, Timothy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to serve a third party subpoena prior to a Rule 26 (f) conference #8 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy Robert Herman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #8 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/1/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Herman, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Notice of Filing)(Herman, Timothy)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLCfor Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference (Herman, Timothy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 9/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (ek, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
July 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Notice of Filing FRCP 7.1 and LR 3.2 Disclosure (Herman, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC by Timothy Robert Herman (Herman, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herman, Timothy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16024455. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.250.180.151
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 108.250.180.151
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Robert Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?