Basi et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: SHARANJIT BASI
Defendant: Acting Director of F David Bowdich, Kevin McAleenan, Mick Dedvukaj and David Bowdich
Case Number: 1:2019cv04707
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to remand #7 is granted. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to Remand: Plaintiff's application for naturalization is remanded to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). USCIS is instructed to issue a decision on plaintiff's naturalization application within 14 days. The case may be reinstated within 30 days of this order if USCIS does not act on the application within 30 days of this order. Each party shall bear its own costs and fees. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 9/24/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Craig Arthur Oswald for presentment of motion to remand #7 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 9/27/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Oswald, Craig)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan to remand (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Oswald, Craig)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Oswald, Craig)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (yt)
July 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SHARANJIT BASI by Mohammed W Ibrahim (Ibrahim, Mohammed)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SHARANJIT BASI by Reem H Odeh (Odeh, Reem)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Odeh, Reem)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SHARANJIT BASI; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16025057. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Odeh, Reem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basi et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of F David Bowdich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Dedvukaj
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bowdich
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARANJIT BASI
Represented By: Mohammed W Ibrahim
Represented By: Reem H Odeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?