Moran Industries, Inc. v. Pajoh, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Moran Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Robert A. Vanek, Pajoh, Inc. and Patricia J. Vanek
Case Number: 1:2019cv04721
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moran Industries, Inc. as to Pajoh, Inc. on 7/18/2019, answer due 8/8/2019. (Knabe, Mile)
July 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Pajoh, Inc., Patricia J. Vanek, Robert A. Vanek (lma, )
July 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Moran Industries, Inc. by Mile Michael Robert Knabe of Mile Knabe (Knabe, Mile)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Moran Industries, Inc. by Mile Michael Robert Knabe of Michael Boxerman (Knabe, Mile)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Knabe, Mile)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Contract filed by Moran Industries, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16027176. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Knabe, Mile)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran Industries, Inc. v. Pajoh, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moran Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Mile Michael Robert Knabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pajoh, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia J. Vanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?