Miracle-Pond et al v. Shutterfly, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samantha Paraf and Vernita Miracle-Pond
Defendant: Shutterfly, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04722
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(tg, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant's second motion to extend the time to respond to the complaint #10 is granted. This is the final extension. Motion presentment hearing set for 8/20/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew David Provance for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/20/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Provance, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Shutterfly, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Provance, Matthew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Defendant Shutterfly, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint #8 is granted. Defendant's responsive pleading due 9/3/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 7/24/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew David Provance for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 7/24/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Provance, Matthew)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Shutterfly, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (Unopposed) (Provance, Matthew)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to Plaintiff's Counsel, Katrina Carroll. (jh, )
July 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Direct assignment. (yt)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shutterfly, Inc. by Lauren R Goldman (Goldman, Lauren)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Shutterfly, Inc. (Provance, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Shutterfly, Inc. (Provance, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Shutterfly, Inc. by Matthew David Provance (Provance, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Provance, Matthew)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019-CH-07050) filed by Shutterfly, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16027540. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Provance, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miracle-Pond et al v. Shutterfly, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shutterfly, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren R Goldman
Represented By: Matthew David Provance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Paraf
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernita Miracle-Pond
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?