Veal v. Department of the Army
Plaintiff: Miss Tonnia Veal
Defendant: Department of the Army
Case Number: 1:2019cv04741
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Fee Notice. (gcy, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 CIRCUIT Rule 3(b) Fee Notice: USCA No. 19-2464. (gcy, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #14 ; USCA Case No. 19-2464. (gcy, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #14 . Notified counsel (gcy, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #14 . (gcy, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of appeal by Tonnia Veal regarding orders #10 . (gcy, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to docket plaintiff's motion to appeal #12 as a notice of appeal. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 8/1/2019. Mailed notice(gcy, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION of Appeal by Plaintiff Tonnia Veal (lma, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff Tonnia Veal's complaint is dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/19/2019. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Tonnia Veal. (gcy, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Tonnia Veal for presentment of before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 7/23/2019 at 09:30 AM. (gcy, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Tonnia Veal for attorney representation, (gcy, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Tonnia Veal for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Tonnia Veal. (gcy, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Tonnia Veal. (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veal v. Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miss Tonnia Veal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?