Howard v. Saul
Plaintiff: Shelah Joan Howard
Defendant: Andrew Saul and Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv04781
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Referring Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Fuentes on consent (doc. #9 ). In accordance with Local Rule 16.4, after the filing of the Administrative Record, the Court will set a briefing schedule. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Fuentes' standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Fuentes' webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (jj, )
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Signed by Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/9/19. (aee, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge. This case will be sent to the executive committee for reassignment. All pending dates before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Alpert, Beth)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Jonathan C. Haile as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Haile, Jonathan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: The Court sets the case for an initial status hearing pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(a) & (c) on 10/16/2019 at 9:30 a.m. and directs plaintiff's attorney to advise each defendant or its counsel of record in writing of the status hearing date. (mk)
July 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shelah Joan Howard by Elise D Crawley (Crawley, Elise)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Shelah Joan Howard by Beth A. Alpert (Alpert, Beth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Alpert, Beth)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shelah Joan Howard; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16036841.(Alpert, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: Jonathan C. Haile
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelah Joan Howard
Represented By: Elise D Crawley
Represented By: Beth A. Alpert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?