Monteleone v. Village of Carpentersville
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Monteleone
Defendant: Village of Carpentersville
Case Number: 1:2019cv04789
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Village of Carpentersville re Response #12 Notice of Filing Answer to Complaint (Gibson, Jennifer)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE by Defendant Village of Carpentersville Answer to Complaint (Gibson, Jennifer)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 9/17/2019 #7 is stricken. The parties should contact Judge Pacold for further proceedings.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0025 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Martha M. Pacolds webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Martha M. Pacold to the Courts criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable Gary Feinerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/23/2019.(sxb, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Village of Carpentersville re attorney appearance #8 Notice of Filing Appearance (Gibson, Jennifer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Village of Carpentersville by Jennifer J. Gibson (Gibson, Jennifer)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 9/9/2019 #5 is stricken and re-set for 9/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019 by Jeffrey Monteleone as to Village of Carpentersville. (Walsh, Patrick) Modified on 8/12/2019 (mc, ).
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
July 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jeffrey Monteleone by Patrick Joseph Walsh (Walsh, Patrick)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Walsh, Patrick)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeffrey Monteleone; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16037925. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Walsh, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monteleone v. Village of Carpentersville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Monteleone
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Carpentersville
Represented By: Jennifer J. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?