Smith v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Peggy Smith
Defendant: CBRE, Inc., Chicago Union Station Company, Total Facility Maintenance, Inc., Scrub, Inc. and National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04800
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Laing, Susan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Laing, Susan)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/17/2019 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report 9/10/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Total Facility Maintenance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Schroeder, David)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Total Facility Maintenance, Inc. by David H. Schroeder (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Schroeder, David)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CBRE, Inc.(Laing, Susan)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by National Railroad Passenger Corporation(Laing, Susan)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Peggy Smith by John Theodore Cichon (Cichon, John)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
July 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Service Proof of Filing Copy of Filed Notice of Removal in Circuit Court by Susan Kay Laing on behalf of National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Laing, Susan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CBRE, Inc. by Susan Kay Laing (Laing, Susan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant National Railroad Passenger Corporation by Susan Kay Laing (Laing, Susan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Laing, Susan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (19 L 006558) filed by National Railroad Passenger Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16039210. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Laing, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Kay Laing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Union Station Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Facility Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scrub, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Susan Kay Laing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Smith
Represented By: John Theodore Cichon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?