Beasley v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Plaintiff: Loretta Beasley
Defendant: Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04809
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 MAILED Remand Letter and certified copy of order #9 dated 7/25/2019 to Circuit Court of Winnebago County, Illinois. (mma, )
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This matter, coming to be heard by agreement and stipulation of the parties to remand this action back to the Circuit Court of Winnebago County, Illinois, the Court having reviewed the stipulation and associated filings, and otherwise being fully advised, IT IS SO ORDERED: l. This matter is remanded back to the Circuit Court of Winnebago County, Illinois due to a lack of jurisdiction over this matter because the amount in controversy does not exceed $75,000.00 2. Each party shall bear its own fees and costs with respect to the removal and subsequent remand of this matter. Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 7/25/2019. Mailed notice. (mma, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Enter ORDER. This matter is remanded back to the Circuit Court of Winnebago County,Illinois. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, July 26, 2019. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Remand Removed Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mohan, Julia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Julia Lynn Mohan for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #5 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Mohan, Julia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Jo-Ann Stores, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mohan, Julia)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Jo-Ann Stores, LLC (Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Mohan, Julia)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
July 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jo-Ann Stores, LLC by Julia Lynn Mohan (Mohan, Julia)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Winnebago County, Illinois, case number (2019 L 0000209) filed by Jo-Ann Stores, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16041041. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mohan, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beasley v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Represented By: Julia Lynn Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Beasley
Represented By: Mark David Brynteson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?