Evans v. United Parcel Service, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michael Evans
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc and Teamsters Local Union No. 705
Case Number: 1:2019cv04818
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Status and motion hearing held on 9/5/2019. Plaintiff's response to Defendant Teamsters Local Union No. 705's motion to dismiss complaint #7 and Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s partial motion to dismiss #14 due by 10/15/2019, defendant's reply due 10/29/2019. Status hearing set for 1/8/2020 at 9:10 a.m. Discovery ordered stayed to 1/8/2020. Mailed notice (cn).
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Hayley Lauren Geiler for presentment of motion to dismiss #14 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/5/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Geiler, Hayley)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc by Jessica Eunseon Chang (Chang, Jessica)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Parcel Service, Inc (Roesch, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 Partial ANSWER to Complaint by United Parcel Service, Inc(Roesch, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Matthew Roesch for presentment of motion to dismiss #14 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/12/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Roesch, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by United Parcel Service, Inc in support of motion to dismiss #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Roesch, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc to dismiss (Partial) (Roesch, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc by Charles Matthew Roesch (Roesch, Charles)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc by Hayley Lauren Geiler (Geiler, Hayley)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 8/21/2019. Defendant Teamsters Local Union No. 705's motion to dismiss complaint #7 is entered and continued to 9/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Khristian Gervais Parker for presentment of before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/21/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Parker, Khristian)
August 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Khristian Gervais Parker for presentment of before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Parker, Khristian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Khristian Gervais Parker for presentment of before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/15/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Parker, Khristian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Teamsters Local Union No. 705 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit CD2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit CD2 Exhibit 2)(Parker, Khristian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Teamsters Local Union No. 705 by Khristian Gervais Parker (Parker, Khristian)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Evans as to United Parcel Service, Inc on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Onyango, Eric)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Evans as to Teamsters Local Union No. 705 on 7/22/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Onyango, Eric)
July 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Teamsters Local Union No. 705, United Parcel Service, Inc (yt)
July 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Evans by Eric Carlos Onyango (Onyango, Eric)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Onyango, Eric)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Evans; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16042531.(Onyango, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. United Parcel Service, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc
Represented By: Charles Matthew Roesch
Represented By: Hayley Lauren Geiler
Represented By: Jessica Eunseon Chang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local Union No. 705
Represented By: Khristian Gervais Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Evans
Represented By: Eric Carlos Onyango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?