Townsend v. Saul
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Townsend
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv04859
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Fuentes on consent (doc. #9 ). In accordance with Local Rule 16.4, after the filing of the administrative record, the Court will set a briefing schedule. The parties are directed to review and comply with Judge Fuentes' standing orders for Social Security Cases and Agreed Orders, which are available on Judge Fuentes' webpage located on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (jj, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/9/2019. (ek, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge. This case will be sent to the executive committee for reassignment. All pending dates before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Cooney, Nigel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Nigel B Cooney as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Cooney, Nigel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The parties shall promptly consult with each other on the following topics: 1) Do they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge; or 2) Do they agree to a voluntary remand to the Commissioner. Status hearing is set for 8/23/2019 at 9:30 a.m. If the parties agree to consent or remand they may notify the court prior to the status hearing and no appearance will be required. Mailed notice (reg)
July 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia A. Townsend by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia A. Townsend by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Patricia A. Townsend for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Daley, Frederick)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia A. Townsend; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: Nigel B Cooney
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Townsend
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?