United States of America et al v. Charpie Construction Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Wrecking Company and United States of America
Defendant: Charpie Construction Company, Inc., Hudson Insurance Company and Charpie Construction Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04863
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Telephone status conference held. Settlement conference is set for 10/02/19 at 1:30 p.m. The settlement conference will be held in the Courtroom, Room #1843. The settlement conference will be conducted in accordance with the Court's Standing Order on Instructions for Settlement Conference, which is enclosed and which can also be accessed from the Court's webpage at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?EBclBxz8ceU=. The schedule for exchange of settlement letters required by the Standing Order is as follows: defendants' counsel shall serve a settlement letter on plaintiff's counsel by 09/09/19, and plaintiff's counsel shall serve a settlement letter on defendants' counsel by 09/23/19. The parties may not change these dates for exchange without either written agreement of the parties or Court order. Defense counsel shall deliver all copies of the settlement letters to chambers by noon on 09/24/19. The parties may not change this date absent Court order. Parties with "full and complete settlement authority," as defined in the Standing Order, must personally attend the conference. The parties who attend the conference shall read all settlement letters prior to the commencement of the conference. Failure to comply with the Standing Order or with the schedule set in this order may result in sanctions. (For further details see order(s) attached). Signed by the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier on 8/21/2019. Mailed notice. (dal, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier: The matter is set for a telephone status conference with the magistrate judge on 08/21/19 at 10:30 a.m. The parties are instructed to jointly call chambers at the time of the conference. Mailed notice. (dal, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference. (cn) Mailed notice.
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Plaintiffs' unopposed joint motion to refer case to magistrate judge to conduct a settlement conference #7 is granted. Status hearing set before this court on 10/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Motion presentment hearing set for 8/28/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Daniel Warman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 8/28/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Warman, Thomas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs National Wrecking Company, United States of AmericaUnopposed Joint Motion to Refer Case to Magistrate Judge for Limited Purpose of Conducting a Settlement Conference (Warman, Thomas)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Charpie Construction Co., Inc., Hudson Insurance Company by Richard M. Hoffman (Hoffman, Richard)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Affiliates Disclosure Statement by National Wrecking Company (Warman, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Charpie Construction Co., Inc., Hudson Insurance Company (lma, )
July 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs National Wrecking Company, United States of America by Thomas Daniel Warman (Warman, Thomas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs National Wrecking Company, United States of America by Jeff Douglas Harris (Harris, Jeff)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Harris, Jeff)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America, National Wrecking Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16050925. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Harris, Jeff)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Charpie Construction Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charpie Construction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charpie Construction Co., Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wrecking Company
Represented By: Jeff Douglas Harris
Represented By: Thomas Daniel Warman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jeff Douglas Harris
Represented By: Thomas Daniel Warman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?