United States of America v. Executive Health Resources, Inc.
Plaintiff: United States of America and Jesse Polansky
Defendant: Executive Health Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04922
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Jeffrey Cummings
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: The government's motion #10 to voluntarily dismiss is granted. All motions are terminated without prejudice. Emailed notice (slb, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Schuyler Anthony Ferguson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #10 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/15/2019 at 08:30 AM. (Ferguson, Schuyler)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings: Plaintiff has filed a motion for voluntary dismissal #10 . This motion is not properly before this Court. Since plaintiff's motion is dispositive, plaintiff is directed to re-notice its motion before Judge Chang in accordance with his motion practice. The 8/15/19 status hearing as well as the notice of motion are stricken; no appearance is necessary on that date. All matters relating to the referral of this case having been resolved, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Judge Jeffrey Cummings no longer referred to the case. (rbf, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Schuyler Anthony Ferguson for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #10 before Honorable Jeffrey Cummings on 8/15/2019 at 10:00 AM. (Ferguson, Schuyler)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Jesse Polansky for Voluntary Dismissal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ferguson, Schuyler)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings:This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Cummings. Status hearing 8/15/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 1350. By 8/9/19, plaintiffs are directed to file a status report in accordance with Magistrate Judge Cummings' Standing Order for Initial Status Report. Mailed notice. (rbf, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Application by Michael Ellis to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted.Emailed notice (slb, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/24/19.(gcy, ) Text Modified on 7/24/2019 (gcy, ).
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16063285. (Ellis, Michael)
July 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 22, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (aee, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to seal document memorandum in support of motion #4 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferguson, Schuyler)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Relator's Motion to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena #1 (Public Redacted) (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-P)(Ferguson, Schuyler)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Schuyler Anthony Ferguson (Ferguson, Schuyler)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ferguson, Schuyler)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE by United States of America Relator's Motion to Enforce Rule 45 Subpoena Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0752-16057697. (Ferguson, Schuyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Executive Health Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Health Resources, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Schuyler Anthony Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Polansky
Represented By: Michael R. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?