State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Candido Concepcion v. Dwyer et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Candido Concepcion and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Defendant: Angelo M. Dwyer and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv04963
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Referring Judge: Sunil R Harjani
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing set for 9/26/2019 at 9:15 a.m. in courtroom 1858. Mailed notice (lxs, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 7/13/2012.(rp, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:In light of the joint consent to the magistrate judge's jurisdiction, the status hearing of 09/19/2019 with Judge Chang is vacated. The consent will be processed with the Executive Committee.Emailed notice (slb, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Wenker, Peter)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to United States of America served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 (Wenker, Peter)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to United States of America served on 8/6/2019, answer due 10/7/2019 (Wenker, Peter)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Kathryn Ann Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Angelo M. Dwyer, United States of America (Kelly, Kathryn)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Status hearing held. Peter Wenker appeared by telephone on behalf of Plaintiff. Counsel for the government has not been assigned (but after the hearing, on 09/09/2019, an AUSA filed an appearance, so that is resolved). Plaintiff shall promptly file the returns of service; service was not accomplished on Defendant Dwyer, but that might not be necessary if there is no scope-of-employment issue. ***The Court strongly encourages the parties to consent to the magistrate judges jurisdiction.*** Status hearing set for 09/19/2019 at 9 a.m., but if the parties file a consent before that date, then the status hearing will be vacated. Emailed notice (slb, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS Report by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Wenker, Peter)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as to Angelo M. Dwyer. (Wenker, Peter)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company by Peter Joseph Wenker (Wenker, Peter)
July 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (jjr, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:Initial status hearing set for 09/06/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
July 25, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Angelo M. Dwyer (mc, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
July 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Candido Concepcion by Jeffrey C McDaniel (McDaniel, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McDaniel, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Candido Concepcion; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16063593. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(McDaniel, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Candido Concepcion v. Dwyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelo M. Dwyer
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Candido Concepcion
Represented By: Jeffrey C McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey C McDaniel
Represented By: Peter Joseph Wenker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?