Carter v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Alecia Carter
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Will County Sheriff and Andrew Martin
Case Number: 1:2019cv05005
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ruben Castillo: This Court has carefully reviewed Plaintiff's pro se complaint and the case docket and easily concludes that Plaintiff's current complaint must be dismissed for failure to plausibly state a claim against the named defendants. Therefore, Defendants, Andrew Martin and McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC's pending motion to dismiss #15 will be granted. Will County Sheriff's motion to extend the time for filing a responsive pleading or motion #11 is denied is moot. The motion hearing set for 8/28/2019 is stricken. In deference to Plaintiff's pro se status, Plaintiff is given until 10/11/2019 to file any proposed amended complaint. However, Plaintiff is requested to consult with an attorney, or file a motion for attorney assistance before proceeding any further. Plaintiff is advised, if she chooses to do so, she may make an appointment to obtain free attorney assistance by scheduling an appointment with the William J. Hibbler Pro Se Assistance Program, 219 S. Dearborn, 20th floor, Chicago, IL 60604 or by calling 312-435-5691. (rao, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 19 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Martin W. McManaman for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/28/2019 at 09:45 AM. (McManaman, Martin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Brian R Merfeld for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/28/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Merfeld, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Andrew Martin, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC re memorandum in support of motion #16 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Andrew Martin, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC #15 , attorney appearance #14 , attorney appearance #13 (Merfeld, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Andrew Martin, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Merfeld, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Andrew Martin, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC (Merfeld, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC by Brian R Merfeld (Merfeld, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Andrew Martin by Brian R Merfeld (Merfeld, Brian)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Martin W. McManaman for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/27/2019 at 09:45 AM. (McManaman, Martin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Will County Sheriff for extension of time Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Filing a Responsive Pleading or Motion (McManaman, Martin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Will County Sheriff by Martin W. McManaman (McManaman, Martin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andrew Martin. (No Executed Date on the Document). (jh, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC. (No Execution Date on the Document). (jh, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Will County Sheriff. (No Execution date on the Document) (jh, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kb, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Andrew Martin, McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC, Will County Sheriff. (kb, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Alecia Carter. (kb, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (kb, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Alecia Carter; Jury Demand. (kb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Raymer Leibert Pierce, LLC
Represented By: Brian R Merfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will County Sheriff
Represented By: Martin W. McManaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Martin
Represented By: Brian R Merfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alecia Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?