United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $30,170
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $30,170 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY and Funds in the amount of $30,170
Case Number: 1:2019cv05094
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: By request of the plaintiff, the status hearing set for 9/17/2019 is stricken and reset to 10/29/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 9/17/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed from United States Marshals Service by United States of America as to Funds in the amount of $30,170 on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (smm, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 ARREST WARRANT IN REM Returned Executed as to Funds in the amount of $30,170.00 on 8/5/19. (smm, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 ARREST WARRANT issued as to In Rem for the funds in the amount of $30,170.00 (aee, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Erin Elaine Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Kelly, Erin)
July 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for forfeiture filed by United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Kelly, Erin)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelly, Erin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $30,170
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $30,170 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $30,170
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Erin Elaine Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?