M.S. etc v. Barrington Community Unit School District 220 et al
Plaintiff: M.S.
Defendant: Lydia Brinkmeier, Heather Rimstidt, Kenneth Hyllberg, Natalie Pollock, BARRINGTON 220 COMMUNITY UNIT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Callen Migacz, Sara Mays and Barrington Community Unit School District 220
Case Number: 1:2019cv05118
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Barrington Community Unit School District 220, Lydia Brinkmeier, Kenneth Hyllberg, Sara Mays, Callen Migacz, Natalie Pollock, Heather Rimstidtin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff M.S. to remand #11 Defendants' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Bothfeld, Emily)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion to set a briefing schedule #14 is granted. Defendants' response to the motion to remand #11 is due by 9/27/2019; plaintiff's reply by 10/11/2019. Motion hearing date of 9/12/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 10/10/2019 is stricken and reset to 11/14/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Emily Plomgren Bothfeld for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule, #14 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/12/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Bothfeld, Emily)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Barrington Community Unit School District 220, Lydia Brinkmeier, Kenneth Hyllberg, Sara Mays, Callen Migacz, Natalie Pollock, Heather Rimstidt to set a briefing schedule Defendants' Motion to Set Briefing Schedule and to Defer Responsive Pleadnig Deadline (Bothfeld, Emily)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Robert R. Dlugajczyk for presentment of motion to remand #11 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/12/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Dlugajczyk, Robert)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The Court is unavailable on 10/3/2019. The status hearing set for that date is stricken and reset to 10/10/2019 at 10:30 a.m. In addition, plaintiff's counsel shall notice the motion to remand for presentment to the court. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff M.S. to remand (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Motion for Remand)(Dlugajczyk, Robert)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff M.S. by Robert R. Dlugajczyk (Dlugajczyk, Robert)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Defendants' motion for extension of time #7 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 9/19/2019. Motion hearing date of 8/15/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Emily Plomgren Bothfeld for presentment of extension of time, #7 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 8/15/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Bothfeld, Emily)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendants Barrington Community Unit School District 220, Lydia Brinkmeier, Kenneth Hyllberg, Sara Mays, Callen Migacz, Natalie Pollock, Heather Rimstidt for extension of time Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Bothfeld, Emily)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to to counsel of record (jjr, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 10/3/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
July 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bothfeld, Emily)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019L005104) filed by BARRINGTON 220 COMMUNITY UNIT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Lydia Brinkmeier, Kenneth Hyllberg, Sara Mays, Callen Migacz, Natalie Pollock, Heather Rimstidt Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16084440. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bothfeld, Emily)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BARRINGTON 220 COMMUNITY UNIT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Lydia Brinkmeier, Kenneth Hyllberg, Sara Mays, Callen Migacz, Natalie Pollock, Heather Rimstidt by Emily Plomgren Bothfeld (Bothfeld, Emily)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants BARRINGTON 220 COMMUNITY UNIT SCHOOL DISTRICT, Lydia Brinkmeier, Kenneth Hyllberg, Sara Mays, Callen Migacz, Natalie Pollock, Heather Rimstidt by Nikoleta Lamprinakos (Lamprinakos, Nikoleta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.S. etc v. Barrington Community Unit School District 220 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lydia Brinkmeier
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Rimstidt
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Hyllberg
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Pollock
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARRINGTON 220 COMMUNITY UNIT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Callen Migacz
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Mays
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrington Community Unit School District 220
Represented By: Emily Plomgren Bothfeld
Represented By: Nikoleta Lamprinakos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Robert R. Dlugajczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?