Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. A.J. Walker Construction Company
Plaintiff: Charles A. Whobrey and Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Defendant: A.J. Walker Construction Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05163
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant A.J. Walker Construction Company. (jn, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 First AMENDED complaint by Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey against All Defendants (McNulty, Caitlin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey as to All Defendants. (McNulty, Caitlin)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. The filing of a joint status report is not required.Mailed notice (srn, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Caitlin Maria McNulty (McNulty, Caitlin)
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Brad R. Berliner (Berliner, Brad)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Charles H. Lee (Lee, Charles)
July 31, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant A.J. Walker Construction Company. (lw, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey by Matthew Wesley (Wesley, Matthew)
July 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McNulty, Caitlin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A. Whobrey; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16089531.(McNulty, Caitlin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. A.J. Walker Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Walker Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Whobrey
Represented By: Caitlin Maria McNulty
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Matthew Wesley
Represented By: Charles H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast & Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Caitlin Maria McNulty
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Represented By: Matthew Wesley
Represented By: Charles H. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?