Lara v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marjorie Lara
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv05209
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Brown, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16280317. (Brown, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Scott Dennis Heffron as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Heffron, Scott)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing and remanding the decision subject to review is due 60 days after administrative record is filed. The Commissioner's motion to affirm the decision and brief in support thereof are due 45 days after Plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after the Commissioner's brief is filed. Parties are encouraged to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge in order receive expeditious ruling on the matter due to the significant caseload of the District Court. Parties are to meet and confer by 9/6/2019 whether they jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee or file an Application for leave to proceed In Forma Pauperis by 9/6/2019. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marjorie Lara by James P. Brown (Brown, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marjorie Lara; (Brown, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: Scott Dennis Heffron
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marjorie Lara
Represented By: James P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?