Gordon v. University of Illinois-Chicago
Plaintiff: Katreesha Gordon
Defendant: University of Illinois-Chicago
Case Number: 1:2019cv05226
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 STATUS Report by Katreesha Gordon (Skaletsky, Scott)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Norman P. Jeddeloh for presentment of motion to dismiss #8 before Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/2/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Jeddeloh, Norman)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by University of Illinois-Chicago in support of motion to dismiss #8 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement Bergholz Case, #3 Supplement Chaidez Case, #4 Supplement Lohrasbi Case, #5 Supplement Mays Gillon Case)(Jeddeloh, Norman)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant University of Illinois-Chicago to dismiss (Jeddeloh, Norman)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant University of Illinois-Chicago by Alexander Lee Reich (Reich, Alexander)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant University of Illinois-Chicago by Norman P. Jeddeloh (Jeddeloh, Norman)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 10/2/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant University of Illinois-Chicago (mc, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ek, )
August 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Katreesha Gordon by Scott Skaletsky (Skaletsky, Scott)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Skaletsky, Scott)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Katreesha Gordon; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16099281.(Skaletsky, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. University of Illinois-Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Illinois-Chicago
Represented By: Alexander Lee Reich
Represented By: Norman P. Jeddeloh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katreesha Gordon
Represented By: Scott Skaletsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?