Central Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Weaver Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Illinois Laborers' and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Laborers' Local Union No. 32, Working Dues, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, North Central Check Off Fund, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, North Central Vacation Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation Trust and North Central Midwest Region Organizing Committee
Defendant: Weaver Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05233
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 10/31/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 10/28/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, North Central Check Off Fund, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation Trust, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, North Central Midwest Region Organizing Committee, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Laborers' Local Union No. 32, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Working Dues, North Central Vacation Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund as to Weaver Construction, Inc. on 8/13/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (Scanlon, Cecilia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
August 2, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Weaver Construction, Inc. (mc, )
August 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Laborers' Local Union No. 32, North Central Check Off Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation Trust, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, North Central Midwest Region Organizing Committee, North Central Vacation Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Working Dues by Stephen Jay Rosenblat (Rosenblat, Stephen)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, Laborers' Local Union No. 32, North Central Check Off Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation Trust, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, North Central Midwest Region Organizing Committee, North Central Vacation Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund, Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, Working Dues by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Northern Illinois Annuity Fund, North Central Check Off Fund, Central Laborers' Annuity Fund, North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation Trust, Illinois Laborers' and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund, North Central Midwest Region Organizing Committee, Central Laborers' Welfare Fund, Laborers' Local Union No. 32, North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting, Central Laborers' Pension Fund, Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund, Working Dues, North Central Vacation Fund, Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16098976. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scanlon, Cecilia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Laborers' Pension Fund et al v. Weaver Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Laborers' and Contractors Joint Apprenticeship & Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers' Welfare Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' Local Union No. 32
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Working Dues
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Illinois Annuity Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers' Pension Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Illinois & Iowa Laborers' Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers' Pension Supplemental Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central Check Off Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central Midwest Region Foundation for Fair Contracting
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Laborers' Annuity Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central Vacation Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central Laborers-Employers Cooperation Trust
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Central Midwest Region Organizing Committee
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Stephen Jay Rosenblat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weaver Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?