Burns v. The Sherwin-Williams Company
Plaintiff: Jason Burns
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05258
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Referring Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16277629. for Peter A. Jacxsens (Buss, Elsa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 STATUS Report Re-Assigned Joint Case Status Report by Jason Burns (Kelliher, Thomas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 STANDING ORDER dated 9/23/19: This Standing Order applies to all civil cases reassigned to the calendar of District Judge Steven C. Seeger. All previously-set status or motion hearing dates are vacated. Any trials set for September 23, 2019 through October 31, 2019 are cancelled and will be re-set by the Court. Unless otherwise ordered, all other previously-set deadlines and schedules remain intact. The Court will set a date for a reassignment status conference after the parties have filed the joint status report. The Court will address already-pending motions at that conference. The parties are directed not to notice or re-notice any motions, with the exception of emergency motions, before appearing at the reassignment status conference. All emergency motions arising before September 30, 2019 should be noticed before the emergency judge. For all emergency motions arising after September 30, 2019, but before the date of the reassignment conference, the parties are directed to contact chambers at (312) 435-5588. Emergency matters must be true emergencies, meaning that a delay in hearing them would cause serious and irreparable harm to one or more of the parties. To help the Court learn about the case, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report by October 1, 2019. If defense counsel has not yet filed an appearance, plaintiff's counsel should prepare the status report. The report shall contain the information requested in the Initial Status Report For Reassigned Case. A Word version of the Initial Status Report is available on Judge Seeger's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The parties must deliver two (2) copies of the Initial Status Report to the courtroom deputy's drop-box outside room 1728 by October 2, 2019. (See order for further details.) Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 9/23/2019: Mailed notice. (sm, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0029 - Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on September 12, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Steven Seeger; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Steven Seeger; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Stevens webpage on the Courts website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Steven Seeger to the Courts civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that he shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger for all further proceedings. Honorable Virginia M. Kendall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/16/2019.(ek, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS Report Initial Joint Status Report by Jason Burns (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelliher, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company. (Buss, Elsa)
September 3, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: At the parties' request and by agreement, initial status hearing set for 9/12/2019 is stricken and reset to 10/2/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (cn).
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company by John Joseph Kohnke (Kohnke, John)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jason Burns by Clifford Wolf Horwitz (Horwitz, Clifford)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Jason Burns by Thomas Aquinas Kelliher (Kelliher, Thomas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 9/12/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by The Sherwin-Williams Company Adoption of State Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Supplement Sherwin William's Answers and Affirmative Defenses, #2 Supplement Sherwin William's Appearance and Jury Demand)(Kohnke, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement STATEMENT by The Sherwin-Williams Company (Buss, Elsa)
August 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Buss, Elsa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company by Elsa Buss (Buss, Elsa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Sherwin-Williams Company by Elsa Buss (Buss, Elsa)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County, case number (2019L006953) filed by The Sherwin-Williams Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16101549. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Buss, Elsa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. The Sherwin-Williams Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sherwin-Williams Company
Represented By: Elsa Buss
Represented By: John Joseph Kohnke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Burns
Represented By: Jay Richard Luchsinger
Represented By: Thomas Aquinas Kelliher
Represented By: Clifford Wolf Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?