Ibanez-Vazquez v. Dart et al
Plaintiff: Yam D. Ibanez-Vazquez
Defendant: Unidentified Correctional Officer and Thomas Dart
Case Number: 1:2019cv05269
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 ENTERED JUDGMENT. (mgh, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By order dated August 8, 2019, the Court denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice and ordered Plaintiff to either submit a properly completed application, including supporting documents, or pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee #5 . In addition, Plaintiff was ordered to show good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed based on apparent false statements in his in forma pauperis application. At that time, the Court warned Plaintiff that failure to comply by September 6, 2019, would result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff has not submitted a renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, paid the Court's filing fee, or showed good cause in writing why the case should not be dismissed. While Plaintiff submitted a change of address on August 19, 2019, the Court's order was not returned and there is no indication Plaintiff did not receive the Court's order. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all pending motions as moot. Case closed. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 9/16/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Yam D. Ibanez-Vazquez of Change of Address (Envelope postmarked 08/14/19) (lma, )
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER :Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this litigation, by September 6, 2019, he must: (1) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400 or (2) submit a renewed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. In addition, by this same date, Plaintiff must show good cause in writing why this case should not be dismissed based on apparent false statements in his in forma pauperis application. If Plaintiff does not comply with this order the Court will summarily dismiss this case. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/8/2019. Mailed notice (mc, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Yam D. Ibanez-Vazquez for attorney representation. (ph, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Yam D. Ibanez-Vazquez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (ph, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (ph, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Yam D. Ibanez-Vazquez (Attachments: #1 (Envelope not postmarked)) (ph, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibanez-Vazquez v. Dart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yam D. Ibanez-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?