Federal National Mortgage Association et al v. Canady et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association and Fannie Mae
Defendant: Midland Funding, Ardis M Canady, Syamasumda Mu Bey and Hannibal Mu Bey
Case Number: 1:2019cv05300
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 REMAND with certified copy of order dated 8/7/2019 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (bg, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (bg, )
August 7, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (bg, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: This action is ordered remanded to the Circuit Court of Cook County for improper removal. Defendant failed to attach a copy of the complaint to the notice of removal. Defendant's application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. #4 . Civil case terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 8/7/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 MANDATORY NOTICE OF CLAIMANT'S RIGHT TO COURT WITHOUT "FEES" by Hannibal Mu Bey. (aee, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Defendants Hannibal Mu Bey, Syamasumda Mu Bey, Ardis M Canady for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (aee, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Hannibal Mu Bey. (aee, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED NOTICE of Removal AND 3 copies from Circuit Court, case number (2018CH16040) filed by Hannibal Mu Bey, Syamasumda Mu Bey, Ardis M Canady, Midland Funding (Exhibits) against Federal National Mortgage Association and Fannie Mae. (aee, ) Modified on 8/6/2019 (aee, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association et al v. Canady et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ardis M Canady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syamasumda Mu Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hannibal Mu Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fannie Mae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?