Siwak v. Xylem Inc.
Plaintiff: Casimir Siwak
Defendant: Xylem Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05350
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ruben Castillo
Referring Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:MIDP disclosures shall be served by 11/4/2019. The status hearing set for 10/8/2019 #10 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 11/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 11/12/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Xylem Inc. (Wallin, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Xylem Inc.(Wallin, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #7 is granted. Attorney Jackie S. Gessner added as counsel for Defendant Xylem Inc. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The order entered 10/1/2019 #9 having been entered in error is vacated. Status hearing set for 10/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 11/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Honorable Ruben Castillo has elected to retire effective September 27, 2019; and It further appearing that cases previously assigned to the Honorable Ruben Castillo requires reassignment; therefore It is hereby ordered that the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Honorable Ruben Castillo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/30/2019.(sm, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16277347. for Jackie S. Gessner (Wallin, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xylem Inc. by Kenneth J. Yerkes (Yerkes, Kenneth)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Xylem Inc. by Mark W. Wallin (Wallin, Mark)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casimir Siwak as to Xylem Inc. on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (Persoon, Michael)
September 9, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Xylem Inc. (mc, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
August 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Persoon, Michael)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Casimir Siwak; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16117993. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Persoon, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siwak v. Xylem Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casimir Siwak
Represented By: Michael Paul Persoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xylem Inc.
Represented By: Jackie S Gessner
Represented By: Mark W. Wallin
Represented By: Kenneth J. Yerkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?