Chambers v. MW Custom Papers, LLC
Plaintiff: LISA CHAMBERS
Defendant: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, Superior Boiler Works, Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Fort Kent Holdings, Inc., Welco Manufacturing Company, Columbia Boiler Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corp., ITT Industries, Goulds Pumps, Krez Group, The, Crane Co., Flowserve Corporation, Spirax Sarco, Inc., Burnham, LLC, Riley Stoker Corporation, Dezurik, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Carrier Corporation, American Biltrite, Beazer East, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Flowserve U.S., Inc., Certainteed Corporation, DAP, Inc., John Crane, Inc., Armstrong Pumps, Inc., Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC, Lennox Industries, Inc., Greene Tweed & Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Ferro Engineering, Zurn Industries, LLC., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, Milwaukee Valve Company, A.W. Chesterton, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC., Union Carbide Corporation, Metropolitan Life Insurance Co., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, Velan Valve Corporation and Weil McLain
Case Number: 1:2019cv05362
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 54 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal #53 , this case is dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear its own costs. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ags)
February 13, 2020 Filing 53 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Maienza, Michael)
January 21, 2020 Filing 52 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held and continued to 2/18/2020 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags)
January 7, 2020 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held and continued to 1/21/2020 a 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next status hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 50 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The parties have reported that the case has settled. The final pretrial conference set for 1/7/2020 is stricken. The jury trial set to begin 1/13/2020 is stricken. Status hearing is set for 1/7/2020 at 11:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to the next status hearing, no appearance will be necessary. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion for leave to file documents under seal #43 is granted. motion hearing date of 12/18/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 48 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC #4 regarding MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to bar Plaintiff's Expert, William Ewing #41 (Clapper, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 47 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC #4 regarding MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to bar Plaintiff's Expert, Dr. Arnold Brody #39 (Clapper, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 46 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC #3 regarding MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to bar Plaintiff's Expert, Dr. Arnold Brody #39 (Clapper, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 45 SEALED EXHIBIT by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC #1 regarding MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to bar Plaintiff's Expert, Dr. Arnold Brody #39 (Clapper, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle R Clapper for presentment of motion for leave to file #43 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Clapper, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC for leave to file exhibits under seal (Clapper, Kyle)
December 9, 2019 Filing 42 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/9/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to bar Plaintiff's Expert, William Ewing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 4)(Clapper, Kyle)
December 6, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to bar Plaintiff's Expert, Dr. Gerald Markowitz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Clapper, Kyle)
December 6, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to bar Plaintiff's Expert, Dr. Arnold Brody (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4)(Clapper, Kyle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Parties are each to submit to chambers by 12/31/2019 the following: proposed voir dire, proposed jury instructions, proposed verdict form, list of all witnesses to be called, exhibit list, any stipulations (as to facts or the admissibility of exhibits), and a brief agreed statement summarizing the case to be read to the jury. Any motions in limine must be filed no later than 12/31/2019; responses by 1/3/2020. Final pretrial conference is set for 1/7/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Parties shall bring copies of any disputed exhibits to the final pretrial conference. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: MW Custom Papers, LLC's ("Mead") motion to compel #32 is granted. See statement. Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/3/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Chambers by Joseph Patrick Trunk (Trunk, Joseph)
December 3, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion hearing held. Ruling to issue by mail. Time is extended to 12/20/2019 for plaintiff to file Daubert motions as to Dr. Henshaw. Mailed notice (ags, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Cross Defendant Lisa Chambers, Plaintiff Lisa Chambers to motion to compel #32 , notice of motion #33 (Maienza, Michael)
November 26, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle R Clapper for presentment of motion to compel #32 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 12/3/2019 at 11:00 AM. (Clapper, Kyle)
November 26, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC to compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Clapper, Kyle)
November 15, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC as Successor in Interest to The Mead Corporation's Requests for Admission, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production by Michael Antony Maienza, Jr on behalf of Lisa Chambers, Lisa Chambers (Maienza, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Service Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Witness Disclosures by Michael Antony Maienza, Jr on behalf of Lisa Chambers, Lisa Chambers (Maienza, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: A joint proposed final pretrial order, proposed jury instructions, and any motions in limine are due by 12/31/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 28 AGREED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 10/30/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held. Enter Agreed Scheduling Order. Final pretrial conference is set for 1/7/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held. Two week jury trial is set to start 1/13/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Status hearing is set for 10/30/2019 at 9:30 a.m. to discuss setting a schedule for any further discovery, motions in limine, and pretrial conference. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Lisa Chambers's motion to remand (dkt. #10 ) is denied. See statement. Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 9/19/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 SUR-REPLY by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC in response to plaintiff's reply in support of motion to remand #16 (las, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: The Clerk's office is directed to file the sur-reply as attached as exhibit 1 in docket entry #17 . Mailed notice (ags, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Mead's motion for leave to file surreply #17 is granted. No appearance required on 9/11/2019. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE by Lisa Chambers, Lisa Chambersin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC for leave to file Surreply #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Vogelzang, Nicholas)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Cross Defendant Lisa Chambers, Plaintiff Lisa Chambers by Michael Antony Maienza, Jr (Maienza, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on August 28, 2019 before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Order Number: 35923. Court Reporter Contact Information: Ms. Joene Hanhardt, Official Court Reporter, 219 S. Dearborn St., Suite 1744-A, Chicago, Illinois 60604, 312-435-6874. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/3/2019. (Hanhardt, Joene)
September 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Adam J Jagadich for presentment of motion for leave to file #17 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 9/11/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Jagadich, Adam)
September 4, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant MW Custom Papers, LLC for leave to file Surreply (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jagadich, Adam)
August 30, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by Lisa Chambers, Lisa Chambers to response to motion #13 , MOTION by Cross Defendant Lisa Chambers, Plaintiff Lisa Chambers to remand #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Vogelzang, Nicholas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion hearing held. Motion to remand #10 is taken under advisement. Status hearing set for 9/4/2019 is stricken and reset to 10/9/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Motion to appear pro hac vice #12 is granted. Attorney John Smyth is added as counsel for defendant. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by MW Custom Papers, LLC to MOTION by Cross Defendant Lisa Chambers, Plaintiff Lisa Chambers to remand #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jagadich, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16173583. (Smyth, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas J. Vogelzang for presentment of motion to remand, #10 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 8/28/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Vogelzang, Nicholas)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Cross Defendant Lisa Chambers, Plaintiff Lisa Chambers to remand (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Vogelzang, Nicholas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 9/4/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Lisa Chambers by Nicholas J. Vogelzang (Vogelzang, Nicholas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (pj, )
August 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC against MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC . by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC(Clapper, Kyle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC by Kyle R Clapper (Clapper, Kyle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC (Jagadich, Adam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC by Adam J Jagadich (Jagadich, Adam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jagadich, Adam)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from CIRCUIT COURT OF COOK COUNTY, ILLINOIS, case number (2018L009039) filed by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16120497. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Jagadich, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. MW Custom Papers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC
Represented By: Adam J Jagadich
Represented By: Kyle R Clapper
Represented By: John A. Smyth, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Boiler Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Kent Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welco Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Boiler Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krez Group, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Stoker Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Biltrite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazer East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennox Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Tweed & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferro Engineering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil McLain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA CHAMBERS
Represented By: Nicholas J. Vogelzang
Represented By: Michael Antony Maienza, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?