Osborne v. Arrow Home Products et al
Plaintiff: Patrick Osborne
Defendant: Janice Labek, Arrow Home Products and Tom Trigsted
Case Number: 1:2019cv05402
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff has submitted a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #9 . The court concludes he is capable of paying a modest fee. The application #9 is granted in part and denied in part, and Mr. Osborne is directed to pay a fee of $25 in 30 days. His motion for attorney representation #10 is again denied without prejudice. The case is at an early stage and Mr. Osborne appears capable of proceeding effectively on his own at this time. Status date of 10/15/2019 stands. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Patrick Osborne for attorney representation. (jh, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Patrick Osborne for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (jh, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is incomplete: Plaintiff remains employed by Arrow Home Products, but he has not included information about his monthly salary or wages as requested in question 2A. of the form application. The application #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is directed to pay the filing fee in full or submit a completed application within 21 days. His motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff has not completed his answer to question 2 of the form motion. In any event, this case is at an early stage and Plaintiff appears capable of proceeding effectively on his own at this stage. Because a successful lawsuit would entitle counsel to recovery of attorneys' fees from the opposing party, Plaintiff is encouraged to continue his search for counsel. Status hearing set for 10/15/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/14/2019. Mailed notice (jh, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Patrick Osborne. (gcy, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Patrick Osborne for attorney representation. (gcy, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Patrick Osborne for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Patrick Osborne. (Attachments). (gcy, ) Text Modified on 8/12/2019 (gcy, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne v. Arrow Home Products et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Labek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Home Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Trigsted
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?