Simmons v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Simmons
Defendant: Kenneth Brink, City of Chicago, Adrian Rosiles, Shadi Sweiss, Thomas Durkin and Albert Rangel
Case Number: 1:2019cv05444
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Unopposed Motion for extension of time to answer #7 is granted. Defendants' responsive pleadings due 10/28/2019. Motion presentment hearing set for 10/1/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (cn).
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Kyle A. Rockershousen for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 10/1/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Rockershousen, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Unopposed) (Rockershousen, Kyle)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Christine Keeyeh Wee (Wee, Christine)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Iris Chavira (Chavira, Iris)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Kyle A. Rockershousen (Rockershousen, Kyle)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald Simmons as to All Defendants. (Garber, Sara)
August 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kenneth Brink, City of Chicago, Thomas Durkin, Albert Rangel, Adrian Rosiles, Shadi Sweiss. (lw, )
August 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kb, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Reginald Simmons by Sara A Garber (Garber, Sara)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Reginald Simmons; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16132556. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garber, Sara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Simmons
Represented By: Sara A Garber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Brink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Kyle A. Rockershousen
Represented By: Iris Chavira
Represented By: Christine Keeyeh Wee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Rosiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shadi Sweiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?