RooR International BV et al v. Smoke Shop XXX, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Defendant: Ashfaque Khanani, Smoke Shop XXX, Inc. and Smoke Shop For You III, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05468
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 10/31/19 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff failed to appear for the 10/10/19 status. Mailed notice(maf)
August 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ashfaque Khanani (rc, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 10/10/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (sxb, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (sxb, )
August 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV, SREAM, INC. by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16134763. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. USPTO- Notice of Recordation of Assignment, #2 Exhibit B. RooR Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit C. License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D. Agreement Scream Roor international, #5 Exhibit E. Product Purchase from Defendant, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RooR International BV et al v. Smoke Shop XXX, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROOR INTERNATIONAL BV
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashfaque Khanani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoke Shop XXX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoke Shop For You III, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?