Walker v. Romme Hospitality LLC
Plaintiff: RICARDO WALKER
Defendant: ROMME HOSPITALITY LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv05495
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The Plaintiff has filed a notice of dismissal #4 , the terms of which are set forth therein. The status hearing set for 10/1/2019 #3 is stricken. Civil case closed. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ricardo Walker (Lee, C.K.)
August 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Romme Hospitality LLC. (lw, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 10/1/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
August 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by RICARDO WALKER; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16137511. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lee, C.K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Romme Hospitality LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICARDO WALKER
Represented By: C.K. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMME HOSPITALITY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?