Hosmer v. Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Hosmer
Defendant: Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157
Case Number: 1:2019cv05507
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157 re answer to amended complaint #8 (Grodsky, Eric)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to amended complaint by Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157(Grodsky, Eric)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 10/15/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. (mk)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Patricia A. Hosmer against Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157 (Smith, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157 by Raymond A. Hauser (Hauser, Raymond)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157 by Eric Sweed Grodsky (Grodsky, Eric)
August 15, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157 (rc, )
August 14, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Patricia A. Hosmer by Michael T. Smith (Smith, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Smith, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Patricia A. Hosmer; Y. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16138803. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hosmer v. Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoover-Schrum Memorial School District 157
Represented By: Raymond A. Hauser
Represented By: Eric Sweed Grodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia A. Hosmer
Represented By: Michael T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?