Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Miracle Supply Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund and Charles A Whobrey
Defendant: Miracle Supply Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05531
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status and motion hearing held. Motion for determination under Local Rule 40.3(b)(2) #10 is entered continued. Defendant's answer is due by 11/1/2019. Status hearing is set for 11/5/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Miracle Supply Company, Inc. by Kevin William Frey (Frey, Kevin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Wesley for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #10 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Wesley, Matthew)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A WhobreyDetermination Under Local Rule 40.3(b)(2) (Wesley, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey as to Miracle Supply Company, Inc. on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Wesley, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 First AMENDED complaint by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey against Miracle Supply Company, Inc. (Wesley, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 10/1/2019 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey by Brad R. Berliner (Berliner, Brad)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey by Albert M. Madden (Madden, Albert)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey by Brandon Andrew Buyers (Buyers, Brandon)
August 16, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Miracle Supply Company, Inc. (mc, )
August 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey by Matthew Wesley (Wesley, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wesley, Matthew)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund, Charles A Whobrey; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16144277.(Wesley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund et al v. Miracle Supply Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central States, Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
Represented By: Brandon Andrew Buyers
Represented By: Matthew Wesley
Represented By: Albert M. Madden
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A Whobrey
Represented By: Brandon Andrew Buyers
Represented By: Matthew Wesley
Represented By: Albert M. Madden
Represented By: Brad R. Berliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miracle Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin William Frey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?