Post Media Systems LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Post Media Systems LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05538
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Agreed motion for initial extension of time to file answer #7 is denied as moot. Agreed motion for initial extension of time to file answer by 12/9/2019 #9 is granted. Motion hearing set for 9/24/2019 is stricken, no appearance is required. Status hearing set for 12/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Clifford Chad Henson for presentment of extension of time #9 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Henson, Clifford)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Post Media Systems LLC for extension of time - Agreed Motion for Initial Extension of Time to File Answer (Henson, Clifford)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Clifford Chad Henson for presentment of before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/24/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Henson, Clifford)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Post Media Systems LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henson, Clifford)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Post Media Systems LLC as to Apple Inc. on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Henson, Clifford)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (cc, )
August 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Apple Inc. (lw, )
August 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jjr, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Post Media Systems LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Post Media Systems LLC by Clifford Chad Henson (Henson, Clifford)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Henson, Clifford)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Post Media Systems LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16146097. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 AO-120 Patent Report)(Henson, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Post Media Systems LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Post Media Systems LLC
Represented By: Neil A Benchell
Represented By: Clifford Chad Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?