United States of America v. Evans
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Kim Evans
Case Number: 1:2019cv05542
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE by United States of America to MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Kim Evans #1 (Dixon, Andrew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. The Government shall respond to Defendant's Motion to vacate/set aside/correct sentence (2255) #1 by 9/23/2019. Reply due by 10/7/2019. Ruling will be by mail. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Andrew J. Dixon as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Dixon, Andrew)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Defendant Kim Evans for attorney representation (pj, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pj, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) and no copies filed by Kim Evans. (09cr152-1). (Envelope not postmarked; institution mail room 08/09/2019) (pj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Wilson
Represented By: Andrew J. Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?