Lahoti et al v. Boeing Company, The
Plaintiff: Parul Lahoti and Sonal Suryakant Raval
Defendant: The Boeing Company and Boeing Company, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv05559
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. See docket 19cv2170 for all further entries. (bg, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court orders all individual related actions, 19 C 4964, 19 C 5079, 19 C 5098, 19 C 5102,19 C 5103, 19 C 5137, 19 C 5352, 19 C 5438, 19 C 5449, 19 C 5559, 19 C 5561, 19 C 5562, 19 C 5563, 19 C 5564, 19 C 5582, 19 C 5756, 19 C 5803, 19 C 5846 to be consolidated under case number l9 C 2170. This order will be implemented by the Clerk of Court submitting JS-6 forms to the Administrative Office for the individual related actions. This will designate the individual related actions as closed for administrative and statistical purposes. This order will not be considered a dismissal or disposition of these actions on the merits. All future pleadings are to be filed in the consolidated case alone (19 C 2170). No pleadings should be filed in any of the individual related actions which are to be administratively closed. Any additional related cases filed in the future and assigned to Judge Alonso will also be administratively closed and consolidated with this case. Should any party believe at any point in the future that separate proceedings have become necessary for that party's particular claims, the party should make a motion in the consolidated case 19 C 2170 seeking relief. The Clerk is also directed to transfer all attorney appearances in the individual related actions to 19 C 2170. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/16/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable John Robert Blakey no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/12/2019. (mc, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 10/3/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 9/23/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Parul Lahoti, Sonal Suryakant Raval by Tracy A Brammeier (Brammeier, Tracy)
August 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Parul Lahoti, Sonal Suryakant Raval by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Parul Lahoti, Sonal Suryakant Raval by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sonal Suryakant Raval, Parul Lahoti; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16148364.(Clifford, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lahoti et al v. Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parul Lahoti
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonal Suryakant Raval
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?