Munguti et al v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Simon Munyao Munguti and Joseph Mutua Musyoki
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05561
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. See docket 19cv2170 for all further entries. (bg, )
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Court orders all individual related actions, 19 C 4964, 19 C 5079, 19 C 5098, 19 C 5102,19 C 5103, 19 C 5137, 19 C 5352, 19 C 5438, 19 C 5449, 19 C 5559, 19 C 5561, 19 C 5562, 19 C 5563, 19 C 5564, 19 C 5582, 19 C 5756, 19 C 5803, 19 C 5846 to be consolidated under case number l9 C 2170. This order will be implemented by the Clerk of Court submitting JS-6 forms to the Administrative Office for the individual related actions. This will designate the individual related actions as closed for administrative and statistical purposes. This order will not be considered a dismissal or disposition of these actions on the merits. All future pleadings are to be filed in the consolidated case alone (19 C 2170). No pleadings should be filed in any of the individual related actions which are to be administratively closed. Any additional related cases filed in the future and assigned to Judge Alonso will also be administratively closed and consolidated with this case. Should any party believe at any point in the future that separate proceedings have become necessary for that party's particular claims, the party should make a motion in the consolidated case 19 C 2170 seeking relief. The Clerk is also directed to transfer all attorney appearances in the individual related actions to 19 C 2170. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/16/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/12/19. (aee, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 10/18/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Simon Munyao Munguti, Joseph Mutua Musyoki by Tracy A Brammeier (Brammeier, Tracy)
August 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Simon Munyao Munguti, Joseph Mutua Musyoki by Kevin P. Durkin (Durkin, Kevin)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Simon Munyao Munguti, Joseph Mutua Musyoki by Robert A. Clifford (Clifford, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Clifford, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Mutua Musyoki, Simon Munyao Munguti; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16148414.(Clifford, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munguti et al v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simon Munyao Munguti
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mutua Musyoki
Represented By: Tracy A Brammeier
Represented By: Kevin P. Durkin
Represented By: Robert A. Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?