Bank of New York Mellon, The v. Blankshain et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Defendant: Jane Blankshain, United States of America, Unknown Owners And Non-Record Claimants and Cedar Crossing III
Case Number: 1:2019cv05579
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 EMAILED Remand Letter with certified copy of Order dated 9/3/19 to Circuit Court of Cook County. (gcy, )
September 3, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ym, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 9/3/2019. Plaintiff's motion for remand #11 is granted. The Court finds that this is a refiling of a previous case that was dismissed first by Judge Chang for lack of jurisdiction and second by Judge Lee. This court will not repeat the reasons for remanding this case provided by Judges Chang and Lee regarding the same property in the Circuit Court. Case is dismissed for lack of timeliness. Defendant has not presented a single legitimate new basis for the removal of this matter. Defendant's frustrations with the foreclosure action and the efforts of her state court attorney are understandable but as stated in open court, this is not the jurisdiction to litigate those complaints. The Court declines to sanction the defendant, but sanctions will be seriously entertained if she again files to remove a matter including the same property on the eve of a sheriffs sale of that property. The Clerk's Office is to remand the case back to the Circuit Court of Cook County forthwith. All pending motions are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ym, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED Notice of Removal by Jane Blankshain. (Exhibits) (mc, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Keith Levy for presentment of motion to remand, motion for sanctions #11 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/3/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Levy, Keith)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The to remand and, MOTION by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The for sanctions (Levy, Keith)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon, The by Keith Levy (Levy, Keith)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (cc, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (cc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jane Blankshain of filing (cc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Jane Blankshain for attorney representation (cc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Defendant Jane Blankshain for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (cc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Jane Blankshain (cc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (cc, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2016-CH-02969) filed by Jane Blankshain Filing fee $ 400. (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit I cont., #11 Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit D, #15 Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit F, #17 Exhibit G, #18 Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit B, #21 Exhibit C, #22 Exhibit D, #23 Exhibit E, #24 Exhibit F, #25 Exhibit G, #26 Exhibit H, #27 Exhibit I, #28 Exhibit A, #29 Exhibit B, #30 Exhibit C, #31 Exhibit D, #32 Exhibit E, #33 Exhibit F, #34 Exhibit G, #35 Exhibit H, #36 Exhibit I)(cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon, The v. Blankshain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon, The
Represented By: Ellen C Morris
Represented By: Alan Samuel Kaufman
Represented By: Keith Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Blankshain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Owners And Non-Record Claimants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Crossing III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?