Craig v. Popmatters Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Glen Craig
Defendant: Popmatters Media, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05596
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Glen Craig by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to comply with Local Rules #8 is granted in part. Plaintiff has until 10/22/19 to comply with Local Rules 83.14, 83.15, and 83.16. The failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case. No further extensions. Counsel is advised to review this district's Local Rules, specifically Local Rule 5.3 regarding noticing of motions. Any failure to comply with the Local Rules may result in a motion being stricken. Mailed notice (is, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Glen Craig for extension of time comply with local rules (Liebowitz, Richard)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff has until 10/15/2019 to comply with Local Rules 83.14, 83.15, and 83.16. Mailed notice (is, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: The Executive Committee, which administers the bar of this Court, notes the following: on August 8, 2019, attorney Richard Liebowitz applied for a pro hac vice efiling account in this Court. After obtaining the account, Mr. Liebowitz used the account to file the first of 12 cases electronically. In each of the cases, the filing fee was paid, but neither appearance forms nor pro hac vice petitions were filed. Local Rule 83.14; 83.16. For now, the Executive Committee posts this entry for the information and potential action of the assigned district judges in each case. Mailed notice. (sm, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED complaint by Glen Craig against Popmatters Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Craig as to Popmatters Media, Inc. on 8/25/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 10/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (kp, )
August 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Popmatters Media, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16152247. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craig v. Popmatters Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popmatters Media, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Craig
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?