Chevrestt v. Paddock Publications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Angel Chevrestt
Defendant: Paddock Publications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05598
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 27 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC (Attachments: #1 Closing order)(rp, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #25 , the case is dismissed without prejudice. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 is denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice(maf)
December 3, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Angel Chevrestt (Liebowitz, Richard)
December 3, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Having failed to file a response to Defendant's sur-reply #22 by 12/2/19, the Plaintiff has waived his right to submit anything further and the Court will take the matter under advisement. Mailed notice (maf)
November 18, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff is given leave to file a response to Defendant's sur-reply. If Plaintiff wishes to respond, he must do so on or before 12/2/19.Mailed notice(maf)
November 12, 2019 Filing 22 SUR-REPLY by Defendant Paddock Publications, Inc. to motion to appear pro hac vice #7 Sur-Reply in Opposition to Richard Liebowitz's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Fliegel, Joshua)
November 12, 2019 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion for leave to file a sur reply #17 is granted. Motion to withdraw as attorney #19 is granted. Status hearing/ruling set for 11/13/19 re: pro hac vice is vacated. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice(maf)
November 11, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Yanling Jiang for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney #19 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/14/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Jiang, Yanling)
November 11, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Attorney Yanling Jiang to withdraw as attorney for Angel Chevrestt. No party information provided (Jiang, Yanling)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Michael Fliegel for presentment of motion for leave to file #17 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/12/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Fliegel, Joshua)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Defendant Paddock Publications, Inc. for leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Richard Liebowitz's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sur-Reply and Exhibits)(Fliegel, Joshua)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 Response to Defendant's Opposition to Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard Liebowitz by Angel Chevrestt (Liebowitz, Richard)
October 17, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Angel Chevrestt by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Docket entry #13 is vacated as entered in error. Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 is pending before the Court. Mailed notice (maf)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/16/2019. Mailed notice. (kp, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 on or before 11/4/19. In his response, Plaintiff must address Defendant's request for sanctions, dismissal of the complaint, and Defendant's suggestion that the Court refer Plaintiff's counsel to the Executive Committee for violations of local rules. Mailed notice(maf)
October 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Paddock Publications, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16319921. #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Fliegel, Joshua)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Paddock Publications, Inc. by Joshua Michael Fliegel (Fliegel, Joshua)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendant is granted leave to file a response to the pro hac vice motion. Mailed notice(maf)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing held and continued to 11/13/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16319921. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit A)(Liebowitz, Richard)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Paddock Publications, Inc. by Matthew T. Furton (Furton, Matthew)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Executive Committee: The Executive Committee, which administers the bar of this Court, notes the following: on August 8, 2019, attorney Richard Liebowitz applied for a pro hac vice efiling account in this Court. After obtaining the account, Mr. Liebowitz used the account to file the first of 12 cases electronically. In each of the cases, the filing fee was paid, but neither appearance forms nor pro hac vice petitions were filed. Local Rule 83.14; 83.16. For now, the Executive Committee posts this entry for the information and potential action of the assigned district judges in each case. Mailed notice. (sm, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 10/9/19 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice(maf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angel Chevrestt as to Paddock Publications, Inc. on 8/20/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (Liebowitz, Richard)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (mma, )
August 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Angel Chevrestt; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16152286. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chevrestt v. Paddock Publications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paddock Publications, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Furton
Represented By: Joshua Michael Fliegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Chevrestt
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Represented By: Yanling Jiang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?