Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Conagra Brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05615
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Timothy J. Haller for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 9/17/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Haller, Timothy)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff Internet Media Interactive Corp. for extension of time Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time (Haller, Timothy)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Internet Media Interactive Corp. as to Conagra Brands, Inc. on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Haller, Timothy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 10/22/2019 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 10/15/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 Ehibits - Patent Information).(smm, )
August 21, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Conagra Brands, Inc. (lw, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT OR TRADEMARK by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S LOCAL RULE 3.4 NOTICE OF CLAIMS INVOLVING PATENT by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
August 21, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Internet Media Interactive Corp. by Timothy J. Haller (Haller, Timothy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Haller, Timothy)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16156868. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Haller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Conagra Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conagra Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?