United States of America v. Andrews
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Peter H. Andrews
Case Number: 1:2019cv05653
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Show Cause hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, the show cause hearing is continued to 3/19/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Show Cause hearing held. Counsel for Petitioner appeared and Respondent Peter H. Andrews appeared pro se. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court and for the reasons stated on the record, the show cause hearing is continued to 1/30/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff United States of America of Order to Show Cause (Terman, Sarah)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Show Cause. Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/19/2019. Mailed notice (rp, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court and for the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's ex parte motion for order to show cause #5 is granted. Enter order. Status hearing set for 12/10/2019 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Fattahi Terman for presentment of motion for order to show cause #5 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Terman, Sarah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for order to show cause (Terman, Sarah)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
August 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Sarah Fattahi Terman as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Terman, Sarah)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Terman, Sarah)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Terman, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter H. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Fattahi Terman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?