Quercia v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Anastasia Quercia
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. and Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05664
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to California Northern District as case 3:19-cv-06901, filed 10/24/2019. (kp, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSFERRED to the USDC Northern District of California the electronic record. (sxb, )
October 18, 2019 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2913 Conditional Transfer Order filed 10/18/2019 (sxb, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC Northern District of California. (sxb, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's agreed motion to extend deadlines and reschedule is granted as follows: the initial status conference set for 10/22/2019 is vacated, and the deadlines for holding a Rule 26(f) conference and exchanging settlement proposals are also vacated. (mk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT to extension of time #11 (Joint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loew, Lauren)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Michelle Loew for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Loew, Lauren)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. for extension of time (Loew, Lauren)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Juul Labs, Inc. (Loew, Lauren)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 10/22/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 9/4/2019. For the reasons stated, the Court grants in part the agreed motion to stay proceedings pending JPML determination #5 . Specifically, the request to stay is denied with respect to any motions challenging subject matter jurisdiction, standing, or other motions under Rule 12(b)(1). Mailed notice. (jjr, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Michelle Loew for presentment of motion to stay #5 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Loew, Lauren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Juul Labs, Inc. of Filing of Attorney Appearance (Loew, Lauren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. to stay proceedings pending JPML Motion (AGREED) (Loew, Lauren)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. by Lauren Michelle Loew (Loew, Lauren)
August 22, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia by Kenneth Brian Moll (Moll, Kenneth)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia by Stephen Michael Cady (Cady, Stephen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anastasia Quercia; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16165329. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cady, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quercia v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Loew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastasia Quercia
Represented By: Kenneth Brian Moll
Represented By: Stephen Michael Cady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?